Presidentes de Nicaragua
Presidentes de Nicaragua
Presidentes de Nicaragua
Len
Granada
Nicaragua
Presidents
1856 - 13 Aug 1856 Jos Mara Estrada (acting) (s.a.)
13 Aug 1856 - Sep 1856 Nicasio del Castillo (acting)
Presidents
20 Jun 1856 - 12 Jul 1856 Fermn Ferrer (provisional)
12 Jul 1856 - 1 May 1857 William Walker (b. 1824 -
d. 1860)
Mosquito
Kings
1661 - 1677 Oldman I
1677 - 1686 Oldman II
1686 - 1720 Jeremy I
1720 - 1729 Jeremy II
1729 - 1739 Peter
1739 - 1755 Edward
1755 - 1776 George I Samuel Roderick Kandler
1777 - 1800 George II Augustus
1800 - 14 Nov 1815 Stephen (king-regent)
14 Nov 1815 - 9 Mar 1824 George III Frederick Augustus (b. ... -
d. 1824)
1824 - Oct 1842 Robert Charles Frederick
Oct 1842 - 4 May 1843 Archibald Alexander Macdonald
(chairman Regency Commission)
4 May 1843 - 17 Apr 1845 Regency
- Prince Wellington
- Lowry Robinson
- Johnson (to 1843)
17 Apr 1845 - 12 Sep 1861 George IV Augustus Frederick
Hereditary Chiefs
12 Sep 1861 - 27 Nov 1865 George IV Augustus Frederick
27 Nov 1865 - 23 May 1866 Henry Patterson
(vice-president of the Council)
23 May 1866 - 5 May 1879 William Henry Clarence
5 May 1879 - 17 Jun 1879 Charles Patterson (1st time)
(vice-president of the Council)
17 Jun 1879 - 8 Nov 1888 George V William Albert Hendy
8 Nov 1888 - 8 Mar 1889 Charles Patterson (2nd time)
(vice-president of the Council)
8 Mar 1889 - 11 Nov 1890 Jonathan Charles Frederick
11 Nov 1890 - 30 Jan 1891 Charles Patterson (3rd time)
(vice-president of the Council)
30 Jan 1891 - 7 Aug 1894 Robert Henry Clarence (b. 18... -
d. 1908)